Trustees The Wallops Women's Institute

Charity number: 292381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Blakeman Chair 31 March 2024
None on record
Sonia Unicombe Trustee 31 March 2024
None on record
Carol Dunlop Trustee 31 March 2024
None on record
PAMELA JANE QUICK Trustee 01 March 2021
OVER WALLOP PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
Gillian Mary Donkin Trustee 01 December 2020
None on record
Thea Shaw Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
Sarah Day Trustee 10 May 2018
None on record