Accounts and annual returns FAVERSHAM CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 292398
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 February 2025 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 February 2025 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 August 2024 197 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 August 2024 197 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 March 2022 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 March 2022 49 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window