FAVERSHAM CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to show the love of God and promote the Christian Faith to people through serving the local community. We do this through a local community initiatives, such as Foodbank and Make Lunch and working with children. Where we can, we provide spiritual and material help to people who come across our path what ever their background. We serve the town of Faversham and surrounding villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 14 August 1985: Standard registration
- 23 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 02 October 2009: Standard registration
- FAVERSHAM COMMUNITY CHURCH (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL TAYLOR | Chair | 01 April 1998 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Claire McVey | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Stiles | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE MCVEY | Trustee | 10 January 2007 |
|
|
||||
BARRY JENNER | Trustee | 28 June 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.04k | £58.63k | £56.90k | £70.41k | £73.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.67k | £45.33k | £50.34k | £66.42k | £80.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 197 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 MAY 1985.
Charitable objects
THE WORSHIP OF GOD, THE INSTRUCTION AND EDIFICATION OF CHRISTIANS, THE CARE AND CHRISTIAN INSTRUCTION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN AND THE EVANGELIZATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN AND THE EVANGELIZATION OF NON-CHRISTIANS, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Room 111
Alexander Centre
15-17 Preston Street
Faversham
Kent
ME13 8NZ
- Phone:
- 07471197617
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window