Trustees FAVERSHAM CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity Number: 292398
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL TAYLOR Chair 01 April 1998
None on record
Alexandra Claire McVey Trustee 15 October 2019
None on record
Phillip Stiles Trustee 16 April 2019
None on record
PAULINE MCVEY Trustee 10 January 2007
None on record
BARRY JENNER Trustee 28 June 2003
None on record