TIBET FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities of Tibet Foundation are: - To promote culture, religion and way of life of Tibetan origin. - To relieves poverty among Tibetan people. - To raise the standards of education and health care in Tibetan communities. - To preserve and support the continuity of Tibetan Buddhist culture and to create a greater awareness of His Holiness the Dalai Lama's message of peace.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- China
- India
- Nepal
Governance
- 22 August 1985: Standard registration
- 01 April 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £226.26k | £250.64k | £751.38k | £123.86k | £166.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £252.17k | £247.91k | £267.17k | £358.15k | £224.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £730.53k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £20.64k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £31 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £187 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £591.17k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £262.25k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £4.92k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £16.84k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £129.97k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 23 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 23 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 30 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 30 January 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 JULY 1985, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 15 SEPTEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
(1) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE CULTURE, RELIGION AND WAY OF LIFE OF TIBETAN PEOPLE AND TO PRESERVE AND PROMOTE ALL ASPECTS THEREOF; (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE OF TIBETAN ORIGIN; (3) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONG THE TIBETAN COMMUNITY; (4) TO ADVANCE TIBETAN BUDDHISM; AND (D) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE TIBETAN MEDICAL TRADITION.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window