Financial history THE COLDEN COMMON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 292438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £88.79k £63.86k £118.93k £90.37k £87.27k
Total expenditure £85.04k £67.13k £101.55k £85.89k £87.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £730 £43.00k £27.37k £3.10k £4.29k