WOKINGHAM THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, maintain, improve and advance public education, particularly by the production of educational plays and the encouragement of arts, including the arts of drama, mime, dance, singing and music and to formulate, prepare and establish schemes therefore, provided that all objects of the company shall be of a charitable nature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wokingham
Governance
- 22 August 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Joanna Lawrence | Chair | 14 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Christopher John Westgate | Trustee | 21 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Merchant | Trustee | 21 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Radburn | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Vallely | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Rees | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Jane Pierce | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Goodhand | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Edward Joy | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diane Hogg | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Daykin | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.04k | £49.26k | £192.60k | £223.37k | £270.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.50k | £126.58k | £162.09k | £162.21k | £185.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.00k | £19.33k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH JULY 1985 AND RULE NUMBER 1 ADOPTED UNDER CLAUSE 22 ON 16 JULY 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF ARTS, INDLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFOR PROVIDED THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOKINGHAM THEATRE
TWYFORD ROAD
WOKINGHAM
RG40 5TU
- Phone:
- 01189890395
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window