BLACK SWAN ARTS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Exhibitions and promotion of the Arts Educational Workshops, talks and outreach work Preservation of the property, formerly the Black Swan Inn
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 24 September 1985: Standard registration
- BLACK SWAN ARTS (Working name)
- BLACK SWAN ARTS LTD (Previous name)
- BLACK SWAN ARTS LTD (Previous name)
- THE BLACK SWAN GUILD LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE BLACK SWAN GUILD LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE BLACK SWAN GUILD LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Little | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Arthur Frank Whitewick | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Edward Fooks | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Paul Webb | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.04k | £114.16k | £128.37k | £155.36k | £177.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.46k | £80.57k | £141.50k | £184.60k | £197.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £26.46k | £41.07k | £3.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4TH SEPTEMBER 1985, AS AMENDED 25 SEPTEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15 DEC 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH WILL ENCOURAGE THE EXERCISE AND MAINTAIN THE STANDARD OF CRAFTS AND IMPROVE CRAFTSMANSHIP AND FOSTER AND INCREASE THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC THEREIN; (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE ARTS AND CRAFTS AND TO FOSTER A GREATER CULTURAL AWARENESS; (C) TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF FROME AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD; (D) TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THE BUILDING KNOWN AS THE BLACK SWAN INN.
Area of benefit
FROME,AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Black Swan Arts
Bridge Street
FROME
BA11 1BB
- Phone:
- 01373473980
- Email:
- office@blackswanarts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window