THE FRIENDS OF TEIGNMOUTH ORANGERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Teignmouth Orangery have renovated and now maintain the Orangery originally built in 1842 in the grounds of Bitton House (currently Teignmouth Town Council offices). Though small the Orangery hosts a wide range of plants from different climate zones. Most imposing is the Brugmansia, native to sub-tropical South America; this is surrounded by oranges, lemons and a banana tree.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 22 August 1985: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Maberly | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEWART HENCHIE | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA WARNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.61k | £408 | £1.40k | £1.11k | £905 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.07k | £1.42k | £697 | £1.90k | £1.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH JULY 1985
Charitable objects
(A) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF THE ORANGERY AT BITTON HOUSE, TEIGNMOUTH (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "THE ORANGERY"). (B) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE ORANGERY. (C) TO ADMINISTER THE ORANGERY FOR THE PROVISION, NURTURE AND DISPLAY OF PLANTS.
Area of benefit
TEIGNBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
55
Yannon Drive
Teignmouth
Teignmouth
Devon
TQ14 9JP
- Phone:
- 07713162631
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window