THE ALCHEMY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support causes in the fields of disability, social welfare, prisons and young carers, with a focus on making a lasting difference to young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 September 1985: Standard registration
- THE STARLIGHT FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR RICHARD STILGOE OBE DL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Caroline Marion Stewart Pedley | Trustee | 26 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
RUFUS STILGOE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Holly Stilgoe | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTOUN EDOUARD ELIAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JEMIMA STILGOE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor Dr Jack Stilgoe | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSEPH STILGOE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALEXANDER ARMITAGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW MURISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.38k | £47.69k | £50.65k | £1.22m | £300.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £567.24k | £623.85k | £269.67k | £191.02k | £341.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.21m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.93k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £191.02k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.39k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £189.63k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14TH AUGUST 1985 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS OF 2ND JUNE 1987 AND 17 JUNE 1996 as amended on 04 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OF PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR UNFETTERED DISCRETION THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR IN FAVOUR OF (A) ANY CHARITIES INVOLVED IN PROMOTING THE MATERIAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELFARE OF:- (I) PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OR DISABILITY AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT IN ANY WAY LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BABIES AND CHILDREN SO SUFFERING; (II) PERSONS SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECT OF FAMINE. (B) ANY CHARITY INVOLVED IN PROMOTING THE MATERIAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CARE AND WELFARE OF THE ELDERLY AND DYING. (C) ANY CHARITY INVOLVED IN MEDICAL RESEARCH. (D) ANY CHARITY BENEFITING CHILDREN. (E) THE ORPHEUS TRUST.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trevereux Manor
Trevereux Hill
Limpsfield Chart
OXTED
RH8 0TL
- Phone:
- 01883 0000000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window