GENESIS RESEARCH TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To foster and promote research into the causes, prevention, diagnosis and treatment of clinical problems associated with childbearing, fertility, fetal and maternal diseases and disorders. This includes basic biomedical research, hospital-based clinical research and large scale studies of public health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2017
Total income:
£1,321,499
Donations and legacies | £402.45k | |
Charitable activities | £597.83k | |
Other trading activities | £199.85k | |
Investments | £121.37k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,665,510
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.44m | |
Other | £0 |
£372,310 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £226.14k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.44m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £226.14k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.44m | |
Retained for future use | £28.30k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 September 1985: Standard registration
- 09 February 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 09 February 2019: Funds transferred to 1179130 GENESIS RESEARCH TRUST
- GENESIS RESEARCH TRUST (Working name)
- THE INSTITUTE OF OBSTETRICS AND GYNAECOLOGY TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.20m | £1.22m | £1.44m | £1.39m | £1.32m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.43m | £1.61m | £1.50m | £1.64m | £1.67m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £153.41k | £213.43k | £269.50k | £364.22k | £402.45k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £436.03k | £340.76k | £514.95k | £255.31k | £199.85k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £489.93k | £550.89k | £529.50k | £647.42k | £597.83k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £118.71k | £118.41k | £127.56k | £123.26k | £121.37k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.07m | £1.36m | £1.18m | £1.40m | £1.44m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £245.00k | £226.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.55k | £10.95k | £10.30k | £295.61k | £61.90k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £927.93k | £728.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £20.39k | £29.55k | £32.25k | £29.25k | £34.25k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £109.63k | £104.20k | £118.30k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £3.68m | £4.27m | £4.58m | £4.59m | £4.82m | |
|
Other assets | £1.63m | £892.24k | £768.81k | £638.51k | £448.09k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £895.54k | £1.00m | £923.94k | £615.44k | £630.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 10 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | 10 May 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 25 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | 25 May 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 07 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2015
(These accounts |
07 March 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 07/08/1985 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07/11/2013
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE BY ALL AVAILABLE MEANS THE STUDY OF HEALTHY CHILD-BEARING AND THE PREVENTION OF DISEASES PECULIAR TO WOMEN AND THE STUDY OF DISEASE AND PARTICULARLY (BUT WITHOUT ANY LIMITATION ON THE GENERALITY OF THIS CLAUSE) DISEASES OF WOMEN, DISORDERS OF CHILD-BEARING AND ALLIED SUBJECTS AND GENERALLY TO IMPROVE THE STANDARD OF KNOWLEDGE OF THE MEANS OF PREVENTION, DIAGNOSIS AND METHODS OF TREATMENT AND CURE OF SUCH DISEASES. (B) TO INITIATE, ENCOURAGE, SUPPORT AND CARRY OUT RESEARCH AND INVESTIGATION IN TO THE CAUSES OF SUCH DISEASES AND THE POSSIBILITIES OF PREVENTION AND ALLEVIATION OR CURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window