ROYAL AIR FORCE HALTON APPRENTICES ASSOCIATION (OLD HALTONIANS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide moral and welfare support to all personnel who served as RAF Aircraft Apprentices. To provide support in the form of donations to Service Charities and charitable organisation local to RAF Halton. To provide a continuing means of contact between ex RAF Aircraft Apprentices.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 December 1985: Standard registration
- RAF HAAA (Working name)
- THE ROYAL AIR FORCE HALTON AIRCRAFT APPRENTICES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wg Cdr RAF Ret'd Francis Denton-Powell MBE | Chair | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gp Capt RAF Ret'd Geoffrey Owen Burton | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Henry Fielder Watts | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wg Cdr RAF Ret'd Barry Robert Neal | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Shardlow | Trustee | 29 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.66k | £47.45k | £55.22k | £67.51k | £85.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.41k | £27.40k | £49.28k | £72.46k | £65.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/08/1985 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 14/08/2002 AS AMENDED ON 25/07/2010 as amended on 19 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PAST APPRENTICE MEMBERS OF RAF HALTON AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF POVERTY, DISABILITY, SICKNESS, INFIRMITY OR OTHERWISE. (2) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ROYAL AIR FORCE AND THE ROYAL NAVY BY MAINTAINING CONTACT BETWEEN PAST MEMBERS OF THE FORMER APPRENTICES SCHOOL, RAF HALTON AND SERVING MEMBERS OF RAF HALTON AND NO. 1 SCHOOL OF TECHNICAL TRAINING, WHERESOEVER THAT MAY BE LOCATED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Pipit Gardens
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP19 0GF
- Phone:
- 01296696896
- Email:
- secretary@rafhaa.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window