THE FRENCH KIER BENEVOLENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty among former employes of French Kier Holdings Plc and their families and dependants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 September 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN MILES STAMFORD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Martin Peter Weston Scarth | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harold Thompson | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR PIP PITTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.63k | £3.34k | £7.87k | £17.88k | £12.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.99k | £3.40k | £7.62k | £17.04k | £12.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23RD AUGUST 1985
Charitable objects
PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THE EMPLOYEES AND FORMER EMPLOYEES AND THEIR RELATIVES AND DEPENDANTS OF FRENCH KIER HOLDINGS PLC AND ITS SUBSIDIARY COMPANIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 RIDGEWAY
EYNESBURY
ST. NEOTS
PE19 2QZ
- Phone:
- 01480404271
- Email:
- haroldthompson157@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window