ELDERLY ACCOMMODATION COUNSEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a free national service to help older people make informed decisions about meeting their care, support and accommodation needs. We lead a network of partner organisations and older people's groups who provide local support and advocacy when required. We maintain, and make freely available, directories of information about services and specialist accommodation for older people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 November 1985: Standard registration
- EAC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR ANN PENELOPE NETTEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Gemma Louise Penn | Trustee | 28 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bruce John Moore | Trustee | 28 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £336.01k | £212.49k | £230.02k | £255.65k | £208.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £446.06k | £283.01k | £221.61k | £197.95k | £136.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £13.93k | £9.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 December 2023 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 December 2023 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 December 2020 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 December 2020 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH NOVEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO THOSE SEEKING ACCOMMODATION SUITABLE TO MEET THE NEEDS OF THE ELDERLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
EAC
Brigade House
Brigade Street
Lonon
SE3 0TW
- Phone:
- 02078203755
- Email:
- enquiries@eac.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window