MILTON BRYAN VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a meeting place for members of the village - activities include indoor sport, whist drives, bingo, jumble sales, children's and adult birthday parties etc....
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 11 September 1985: Standard registration
- THE VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- MILTON BRYAN HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katharine Rosemary Rogers | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Falle | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HINTON | Trustee | 08 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.73k | £301 | £5.46k | £7.72k | £6.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.29k | £2.03k | £3.86k | £9.05k | £4.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED THE 1ST DAY OF AUGUST 1985
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF MILTON BRYAN AND BATTLESDEN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
21D CHURCH END
MILTON BRYAN
MILTON KEYNES
MK17 9HR
- Phone:
- 01525211817
- Email:
- johnmagshinton@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window