THE COLLIER STREET VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 292572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising to maintain / rebuild village hall and provide information to village. Organisation of community events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £556

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 November 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gillian Harker Trustee 28 February 2022
None on record
Benjamin James Ward Trustee 31 January 2022
None on record
Deborah Papas Trustee 31 January 2022
None on record
Kelly Andersen Rigden Trustee 31 January 2022
None on record
Andrew John Papas Trustee 31 January 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £885 £9.22k £1.26k £883 £556
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 April 2025 164 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 March 2025 509 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Ashmead Cottages
Sheephurst Lane
Marden
TONBRIDGE
Kent
TN12 9PB
Phone:
01892 123456