NARBOROUGH AND NARFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Community Centre that houses a number of organisations that hire its facilities including toddler group, craft group, line dancing, bingo, and fund raising activities - these activities are open to people within the village of Narborough and Narford and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
Total income includes £6,889 from 5 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 21 September 1985: Standard registration
- NARBOROUGH COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benda Sands | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Rhys Williams JP | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Pipe | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.80k | £33.31k | £29.64k | £31.60k | £32.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.45k | £30.95k | £25.41k | £19.22k | £33.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £240 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.30k | N/A | £18.77k | £6.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 669 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 15 August 2022 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1764 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21ST SEPTEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITATNS OF THE PARISH OF NARBOROUGH (INCLUDING THE FORMER PARISH OF NARFORD) IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR THER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS AND FOR THE PURPOSE OF RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS IN SUCH MANNER AS THE COMMITTEE OF MANAGEMENT FROM TIME TO TIME SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NARBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Narborough Community Centre
Chalk Lane
Narborough
KING'S LYNN
Norfolk
PE32 1SR
- Phone:
- 01760 338639
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window