BATTLE AND DISTRICT HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society was founded to encourage the knowledge and study of history within Battle and the surrounding area. This is achieved through a programme of illustrated lectures by specialists in their subjects and the publication of books and journals that are relevant to the local history of Battle.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- East Sussex
Governance
- 08 May 1986: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Sydney Moore | Chair | 21 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Alan Petty | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rowena Kemp | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Paul Doherty | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Shepperd | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Hedley MacDonald Alderton BSc PhD | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Doherty | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier Hugh Willing CBE | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
NEIL CLEPHANE-CAMERON | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hall | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Field | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.50k | £4.98k | £5.62k | £7.22k | £7.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.59k | £4.45k | £8.31k | £5.70k | £3.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION OF THE SOCIETY 22 NOVEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED 04 NOVEMBER 1988, 22 NOVEMBER 1991, 20 NOVEMBER 1992 AND 28 NOVEMBER 1997. AS AMENDED ON 15 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 MAR 2019 as amended on 21 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
The object of the Society shall be to educate the public in the study of history in Battle, East Sussex and the surrounding area. In furtherance of the above object, but not further or otherwise, the Society through its Committee shall have the following powers: (a) to arrange for the study, investigation, discussion and publication of matters of local historical or antiquarian interest; (b) to acquire or receive as gifts, maintain and exhibit articles of historical interest pertaining to Battle and the surrounding areas; (c) to arrange and provide or assist in the arrangement and provision of visits to areas of historical, archaeological and architectural interest; (d) to raise funds and to invite and receive contributions from any person or persons whatsoever by way of subscription, donation or otherwise, provided that the Society shall not undertake any permanent trading activities, in raising funds for its charitable objects; (e) to do all such other lawful things as shall further the above objects or any of them.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Appletree Cottage,
Beacon Lane,
Staplecross
ROBERTSBRIDGE
East Sussex
TN32 5QP
- Phone:
- 07818210786
- Website:
-
battlehistorysociety.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window