SIDMOUTH HOSPISCARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sidmouth Hospiscare provides a 24 hour on call service by professional nurses for terminally ill patients as well as support for carers/relatives of the terminally ill in the Sidmouth catchment area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 13 September 1985: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Alan Hancock Cook | Chair | 16 October 2018 |
|
|||||||
Dr Jane Elisabeth Coop | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|||||||
Janet Patricia Webber | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|||||||
Keith Wilson Gillanders | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rachael Mackinnon | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Hilary Anne Elizabeth Nelson | Trustee | 21 August 2021 |
|
|||||||
Ian Barlow | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|||||||
Catherine Suzanne Walden | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|||||||
PHILIP CRANCH | Trustee | 07 May 2013 |
|
|||||||
DAVID HAROLD LEE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.88k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £492 | £510 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 27 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH JULY 1985
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF TERMINAL CARE AND SUPPORT FOR PATIENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND FRIENDS AT HOME OR IN A HOSPICE.
Area of benefit
SID VALLEY AREA AND EAST DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church Street
Sidford
Sidmouth
Devon
EX10 9RL
- Phone:
- 01395578707
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window