THE STEWART TRUST

Charity Number: 292618
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Spread of religion and relief of poverty

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset
  • Hampshire
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 September 1985: Standard registration
  • 31 October 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • TST HEALING HOMES (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £36.88k £530 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £45.10k £2.94k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 25 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 02 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 29 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required