THE GANDHI FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Gandhi Foundation exists to spread knowledge of the insights and work of Mohandas Gandhi and to show their relevance for us today. Each year we hold a multi-faith celebration, an AGM and workshop, a residential gathering, a public lecture and the presentation of the International Gandhi Peace Award. A newsletter, 'The Gandhi Way', is published quarterly. See www.gandhifoundation.org
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 September 1985: Standard registration
- THE GANDHI FOUNDATION (Working name)
- THE GANDHI TRUST (Previous name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK HODA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SYED OMAR HAYAT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGE DICKSON PAXTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.98k | £32.54k | £2.89k | £2.42k | £60.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.10k | £3.33k | £7.86k | £4.89k | £1.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST SEPTEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED 25TH JULY 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE TEACHING OF MAHATMA GANDHI AND TO CONDUCT STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO SUCH TEACHINGS AND TO PUBLISH USEFUL RESULTS OF EACH STUDY AND RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 NORTON ROAD
BRISTOL
BS4 2EZ
- Phone:
- 01179093491
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window