THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF FRAMEWORK KNITTERS EDUCATION CHARITY

Charity number: 292630
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promote Education in all aspects of the knitting industry

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £74,076
Total expenditure: £70,249

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 September 1985: Standard registration
  • 01 April 2014: Funds received from 700469 THE DON GWILLIM CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 08 March 2017: Funds received from 528277 THE KNITTING INDUSTRIES TRAINING AND RESEARCH FUND
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Edward Strange Trustee 09 September 2023
None on record
Paul Seymour Bonnett Trustee 21 April 2023
None on record
Catherine Fuller Trustee 23 April 2021
None on record
Susan Jagelman BSc Hons Trustee 23 April 2021
None on record
Simon Burrows Trustee 20 January 2021
None on record
Martin Traynor Trustee 07 September 2019
None on record
Jane Martin DL Trustee 18 January 2019
None on record
PETER WHITE Trustee 10 February 2017
None on record
ELIZABETH FOX Trustee 10 February 2017
THE TEXTILE INSTITUTE
Received: On time
CAPITB TRUST
Received: On time
JULIAN GARTH ELLIS Trustee 20 January 2017
ROLLESTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
PHILIP TRANTER Trustee 16 January 2015
None on record
Jonathan James Pears Trustee 02 January 2013
THE J REGINALD CORAH FOUNDATION FUND
Received: On time
Margaret Elizabeth Green Trustee 02 January 2013
THE BUTLER TRUST
Received: On time
THE OSBORNE SWITHLAND CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
D BYFORD 'D' CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
ANTHONY HENRY JARVIS Trustee 02 January 2013
THE CONSANGUINITARIUM
Received: On time
LEICESTER CHARITY ORGANISATION SOCIETY
Received: On time
LEICESTER INDIGENT OLD AGE SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE MANSION TRUST (UK )
Received: On time
R. DAPHNE PLUNKET CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID PETER CORAH Trustee
THE J REGINALD CORAH FOUNDATION FUND
Received: On time
THE LEICESTERSHIRE TRUST FOR THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAY BUNGALOWS FOR DISABLED PERSONS
Received: On time
MATTHEW RUSSELL ELLIS Trustee
THE GEORGE ERNEST ELLIS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
GRAHAM SMITH Trustee
AGE UK LEICESTER SHIRE AND RUTLAND LIMITED
Received: On time
AGE UK LEICESTERSHIRE & RUTLAND(MEASHAM)
Received: On time
LINDA Bentata JP BA Trustee
None on record
SHEILA TURNER BENG Trustee
None on record
GEORGE FRED CRAIG TURNEr Trustee
None on record
STEPHEN WOOLFE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £79.13k £57.02k £71.52k £59.06k £74.08k
Total expenditure £71.59k £12.60k £81.67k £70.13k £70.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 04 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
White House Farm
Mill Lane
Scamblesby
LOUTH
Lincolnshire
LN11 9XP
Phone:
020 7871 7966