Financial history THE LONDON SUZUKI GROUP

Charity number: 292638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £89.90k £293.51k £464.67k £513.89k £600.05k
Total expenditure £148.73k £332.54k £384.12k £486.88k £551.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £487.27k £506.71k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £26.63k £93.34k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £486.88k £0
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £551.85k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £1.50k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0