Financial history BATH CANCER UNIT SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 292643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £157.17k £75.36k £76.22k £185.89k £547.55k
Total expenditure £372.95k £111.39k £9.69k £10.83k £153.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £512.94k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £32.00k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.61k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £387.68k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £144.62k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.18k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £144.52k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0