Governing document BATH CANCER UNIT SUPPORT GROUP

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 04/09/1985 AS AMENDED ON 18/03/1992 AS AMENDED ON 11/01/2012 AS AMENDED ON 05/12/2012 as amended on 14 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF THE ONCOLOGY AND RADIOTHERAPY UNIT AT THE BATH ROYAL UNITED HOSPITAL AND OTHER HEALTH UNITS PROVIDING THE SAME OR SIMILAR OR RELATED SERVICES FOR PATIENTS WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES FROM TIME TO TIME OF THE BATH HEALTH DISTRICT IN PARTICULAR BY RAISING MONEY TO PURCHASE EQUIPMENT AND PROVIDE FACILITIES AND SERVICES NOT PROVIDED BY THE HEALTH AUTHORITY OR BY ANY TRUST ASSOCIATED WITH THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WHICH ADMINISTERS AND GOVERNS THE BATH ROYAL UNITED HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
BATH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.