THE REMOTE SENSING AND PHOTOGRAMMETRY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Outreach, education, discussion, publication and promotion of the scientific and technical disciplines of remote sensing and photogrammetry in the United Kingdom and abroad.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 September 1985: Standard registration
- RSPSOC (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Smye-Rumsby | Chair | 13 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ruusa Magano David | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Samuel James Valman | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yanna Alexia Fidai | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vahid Akbari | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Andrew Warren | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Meredith Williams | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nikolaos Galiatsatos | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alessandro Novellino | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sam Pike | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.29k | £92.69k | £82.03k | £53.04k | £50.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.86k | £96.64k | £84.39k | £116.21k | £121.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MAY 1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 13 SEPTEMBER 2000, 10 SEPTEMBER 2009 AND 4 SEPTEMBER 2014 as amended on 13 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE MANY FIELDS OF REMOTE SENSING AND PHOTOGRAMMETRY AND TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS TO BE DERIVED FROM THEIR APPLICATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Space Park Leicester
92 Corporation Road
Leicester
LE4 5SP
- Phone:
- 07355263520
- Email:
- office@rspsoc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window