THATCHAM WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 292650
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Thatcham branch of the Berkshire Federation of the Woman's Institute.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008

Total income: £3,107
Total expenditure: £2,819

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • West Berkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 October 1985: Standard registration
  • 30 April 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • THATCHAM WOMENS INSTITUTE (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008
Total gross income £2.92k £2.90k £2.74k £3.73k £3.11k
Total expenditure £3.01k £2.75k £2.77k £3.87k £2.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 11 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 12 March 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 16 April 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 15 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 24 March 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required