Financial history THE UNITARIAN SOCIETY FOR PSYCHICAL STUDIES

Charity number: 292651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.50k £774 £825 £1.29k £2.18k
Total expenditure £1.42k £111 £479 £757 £1.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A