THE DANA CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY HAS BEEN INACTIVE FOR A NUMBER OF YEARS..WE AIM TO WIND DOWN THE TRUST IN 2013 BY MAKING SIGNIFICANT DONATIONS IN THE FIELDS OF MEDICAL,EDUCATIONAL,RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS. THE ORIGINS OF THE CHARITY WERE IN WOLVERHAMPTON AND PRIORITY WILL BE GIVEN.TO (W) MIDLANDS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 July 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Northamptonshire
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 19 September 1985: Standard registration
- 12 June 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/07/2009 | 29/07/2010 | 29/07/2011 | 29/07/2012 | 29/07/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.35k | £1.19k | £1.00k | £250 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 July 2013 | 25 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 July 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 July 2012 | 15 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 July 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 July 2011 | 19 June 2012 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 July 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 JULY 1960 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 31 MARCH 1987 AND AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 3 AUGUST 1987 AND AS VARIED BY A DEED OF VARIATION DATED 22 DECEMBER 1995.
Charitable objects
SUCH OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES WHICH ARE LEGALLY CHARITABLE: 1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS BY DIRECT PAYMENTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES OR BY CONTRIBUTIONS TO AN APPROVED CHARITABLE ORGANISATION OR FUND ALREADY EXISTING FOR THIS PURPOSE OR EXISTING AT THE TIME OF SUCH INTENDED APPLICATION, AND 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY CONTRIBUTION TO SUCH EDUCATIONAL ORGANISATIONS OR FUNDS AS ARE ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window