Governing document HARROW FILM MAKERS
Charity number: 292696

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/09/1985 AS AMENDED ON 20/11/1989 AS AMENDED ON 12/04/1998 AS AMENDED ON 13/06/2005 AS AMENDED ON 08/09/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF VIDEOGRAPHY, CINEMATOGRAPHY, MOTION PICTURES AND ASSOCIATED AUDIO AND VISUAL ARTS AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ARTS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.