THE BAUER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity's giving is an expression of its faith-based belief.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of London
- Dorset
- Warwickshire
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 09 October 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Smith | Trustee | 19 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Keen | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mary Wendy Treacher | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £221 | £8 | £57 | £329 | £449 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £2.90k | £1.50k | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST SEPTEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITIES AND SUCH SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE SETTLORS FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT IN WRITING AND IN DEFAULT OR IN SO FAR AS ANY SUCH DIRECTION MAY NOT EXTEND AS THE TRUSTEES MAY AT THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCREATION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 FLEET STREET
BEAMINSTER
DT8 3EF
- Phone:
- 01308862154
- Email:
- mt1935@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
22fleetstreet.beaminsterdt83ef
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window