ABINGDON COLLEGE AND DISTRICT FILM SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To screen around 10 films in a season from October to June covering a range of English and foreign language, contemporary and archive film. To occasionally invite specialist speakers to introduce selected films.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 01 November 1985: Standard registration
- 17 March 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
- A B C D FILM SOCIETY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.29k | £3.80k | £2.41k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.55k | £4.92k | £2.79k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 362 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 362 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 31 January 2021 | 245 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 17TH JANUARY 1985 as amended on 20 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS PARTICULARLY THE ART OF FILM AND ALLIED VISUAL TECHNIQUES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE FOREGOING OBJECT BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE THE SOCIETY SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND APPRECIATION OF FILMS BY MEANS OF LECTURES, DISCUSSIONS AND EXHIBITIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window