Accounts and annual returns NOAH'S ARK CLUB

Charity number: 292757
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 January 2018 On Time