THE SWAN THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the company are to educate the public in the dramatic arts and further the development of public appreciation and taste in the said arts in Yeovil and District.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 17 October 1985: Standard registration
- YEOVIL DRAMATIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Ann Matthews | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Graydon | Trustee | 30 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Middleton | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dick Bennett | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Harding | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Williams | Trustee | 12 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Annetta Broughton | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Payne | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.18k | £21.69k | £74.01k | £68.21k | £88.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.74k | £20.83k | £75.24k | £60.25k | £78.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £26.17k | £1.25k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 01 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 1ST APRIL 1985
Charitable objects
(A) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC ARTS AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS IN YEOVIL AND DISTRICT IN PARTICULAR AND MAINTAINING A THEATRE TO BE KNOWN AS THE SWAN THEATRE. (B) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE CAUSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
YEOVIL AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Swan Theatre
Swan Theatre
138 Park Street
Yeovil
BA20 1QT
- Phone:
- 01935428646
- Email:
- swantheatre@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window