NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF EX-PRISONERS OF WAR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the welfare of those who during service with United Kingdom or Allied Forces were made prisoner of war. We produce a quarterly newsletter and attend selected rememberance parades.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 October 1985: Standard registration
- 25 May 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- N E X P O W A (Working name)
- THE NATIONAL EX-PRISONER OF WAR ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.83k | £5.95k | £4.13k | £3.99k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.82k | £13.47k | £21.92k | £14.86k | £5.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 04 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 05 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 24 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 24 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH SEPTEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO RELIEVE POVERTY OR SICKNESS AMONGST OFFICERS WARRANT OFFICERS NON-COMMISSIONED OFFICERS AND OTHER RANKS WHO SERVED IN HER MAJESTY'S OR ALLIED FORCES OR IN THE NURSING SERVICES AND WHO, DURING SUCH SERVICE WERE PRISONERS OF WAR IN ANY THEATRE OF WAR WHATSOEVER, AND THEIR WIDOWS AND DEPENDANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window