THE SIR HEINZ KOEPPLER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust advances the Wilton Park purpose through educational activities, such as funding participants identified by Wilton Park, the FCDO policy forum. Recently the Trust has sponsored, written and edited a major book on Wilton Park's global policy discussions since 1946 - see https://www.routledge.com/The-Policies-and-Power-of-Public-Diplomacy-Wilton-Parks-Road/Hopkinson/p/book/9781032831251
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- West Sussex
Governance
- 16 January 1986: Standard registration
- KOEPPLER TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS GUY RATHBONE HOPKINSON | Chair | 20 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Alison Weston | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
His Honour Richard Saul Harper MA Oxon | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Ian Fox | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Malini Mehra BA MA FRSA | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Neil Carmichael | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|||||
DAVID AUBERTIN GRACE | Trustee | 14 December 2015 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY GRAHAM BRUCE | Trustee | 05 November 2002 |
|
|
||||
JUDY KIRBY | Trustee | 09 July 1994 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Collecott | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.99k | £4.59k | £3.73k | £4.18k | £5.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.77k | £3.03k | £875 | £2.09k | £1.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22ND MAY 1982 AS AMENDED BY MEMORANDUM MADE 8 APRIL 2003 AND ORDER UNDER S26 OF CHARITIES ACT 1993 DATED 2 JULY 2003 AS AMENDED ON 03 JUL 2014 as amended on 18 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
PROMOTING, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ABOUT 1. WORLD AFFAIRS, AND 2. THE INFLUENCE UPON NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL POLICIES, OF A. THE DIVERSE CULTURES B. HISTORICAL PERSPECTIVES C. GOVERNMENTAL STRUCTURES AND POWERS D. POLITICAL ASSUMPTIONS AND ATTITUDES - OF THE PEOPLES AND NATIONS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Goring Road
STEYNING
West Sussex
BN44 3GF
- Phone:
- 07447914621
- Email:
- nick.hopkinson@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window