THE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT TRUST

Charity number: 292880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

provision of services for the continuation and development of charitable hospitals and care homes in the United Kingdom

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 November 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT TRUST (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Healthcare Inspectorate Wales (HIW)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Faiz Shivji Trustee 13 January 2025
None on record
Justin Mark Jones Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
Dr Michael Emad Asham Shenouda Trustee 26 July 2023
None on record
Lisa Jane Geary Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
Janis Sanders Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
GLEN VON MALACHOWSKI Trustee 20 April 2016
VINCENTIAN CARE PLUS
Received: On time
Mark Gerold Trustee 16 September 2015
None on record
DYLAN JONES Trustee 04 March 2013
UPPINGHAM SCHOOL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £33.81m £29.27m £38.96m £45.56m £50.56m
Total expenditure £33.90m £30.44m £40.57m £47.27m £48.56m
Income from government contracts £15.53m £15.02m £14.61m £14.72m £16.94m
Income from government grants N/A £183.28k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £539 £8.14k £0 £730 £31.49k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £33.53m £28.90m £38.89m £45.55m £50.46m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £279.44k £94.78k £77.53k £7.01k £67.15k
Income - Other £0 £263.95k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £31.49k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £33.86m £30.33m £40.20m £46.79m £48.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £37.77k £119.58k £365.34k £477.63k £530.94k
Expenditure - Governance £96.47k £51.73k £64.69k £91.36k £62.74k
Expenditure - Grants institution £391.61k £181.72k £43.16k £47.05k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £37.77k £0 £18.09k £4.18k £0
Expenditure - Other £368 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £18.83m £30.43m £32.94m £30.72m £30.73m
Long-term investments £5.41m £2.70m £0 £0 £0
Other assets £5.40m £5.78m £9.74m £6.67m £9.36m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £6.18m £16.79m £21.94m £18.40m £19.10m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Healthcare Management Trust
1 Langdon House
Langdon Road
Swansea
SA1 8QY
Phone:
02072221177