DEVON RURAL SKILLS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain the Traditional Rural Skills which have made Devon the place it is.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 06 November 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nic Kirkham | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Joynes | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS BAKER | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Laura Tunstall Murray | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN COOPER | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|||||
NICK DAWE | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID DINGLE | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
DONALD WILLIAM GASKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.81k | £3.03k | £9.77k | £8.43k | £12.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.84k | £3.59k | £8.26k | £15.39k | £16.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27TH SEPTEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE PRESERVATION OF RURAL CRAFTS AND SKILLS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PROVIDING AND PROMOTING THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, INSTRUCTION AND TRAINING IN ALL SUCH RURAL SKILLS AND CRAFTS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION CONSIDER WORTHY OF PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
1a Jesmond Road
Exeter
EX1 2DG
- Phone:
- 07815189911
- Email:
- payments@drst.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window