Financial history THE ARTANGEL TRUST

Charity number: 292976
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.08m £1.41m £1.61m £1.59m £1.56m
Total expenditure £1.88m £1.23m £1.81m £1.60m £1.47m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £876.43k £868.02k £871.17k £868.02k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £394.58k £1.17m £1.22m £1.10m £1.20m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.67m £175.72k £291.64k £370.52k £136.73k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £18.51k £3.72k £646 £18.12k £50.30k
Income - Other £0 £61.18k £94.75k £105.86k £178.32k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.73m £1.10m £1.69m £1.47m £1.35m
Expenditure - Raising funds £145.34k £128.41k £121.73k £131.97k £122.75k
Expenditure - Governance £9.51k £0 £10.28k £0 £18.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0