Financial history THE FARRANT SINGERS

Charity number: 292993
Charity reporting is up to date (65 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £10.53k £9.23k £7.32k £8.65k £13.48k
Total expenditure £11.38k £9.15k £4.11k £10.24k £19.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A