THE ESSEX SHIRE HORSE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organize events involving Heavy Horses to raise money for the promotion of the breeds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Suffolk
Governance
- 12 November 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SELWYN PEACOCK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sarah Lawrence | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hollie Brook | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Billie Young | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Hobin | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Andrews | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Hobin | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Toomer-Harlow | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
DENISE DILLON | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|||||
GRAHAM COLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.84k | £1.36k | £4.34k | £9.25k | £8.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.76k | £738 | £5.80k | £9.17k | £8.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 23RD APRIL 1985
Charitable objects
(A) TO IMPROVE THE BREED AND PROMOTE THE BREEDING OF SHIRE HORSES. (B) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE FOREGOING OBJECTS, BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE THE ASSOCIATION MAY OBTAIN THE SERVICE OF THE BEST POSSIBLE REGISTERED SIRES FOR MARES BELONGING TO ANY MEMBER OF THE PUBLIC, AND MAY DO ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL ACTS AS MAY BE NECESSARY FOR THE ATTAINMENT OF THE SAID OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Hickling Close
LEIGH-ON-SEA
SS9 4SX
- Phone:
- 07720257220
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window