WILLOW BANK PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Willow Bank Preschool offers sessional care for 3-5 year olds and provides a safe, stimulating and caring environment that promotes learning through play
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £141,821 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Wokingham
Governance
- 18 November 1985: Standard registration
- WILLOW BANK PLAYGROUP ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- WILLOW BANK PLAYSCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- WILLOW BANK PRE SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shannon Rosier | Chair | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicol Bunce | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hanne Deweer | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hashim Syed | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Wellings | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Heath | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Taylor White | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.16k | £157.60k | £155.80k | £159.36k | £161.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.73k | £119.72k | £155.04k | £149.08k | £138.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £125.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £153.10k | £142.86k | £139.94k | £141.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 July 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 July 2020 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/06/1984 AS AMENDED ON 19/10/1999 AS AMENDED ON 19/01/2011
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
WOODLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
DUFFIELD ROAD
WOODLEY
READING
BERKSHIRE
RG5 4RW
- Phone:
- 01189272338
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window