LAWYERS MUSIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Performance of classical orchestral and choral music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 February 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Isabella Dal Soglio | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tom Le Brocq | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Jane Curd | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sahar Sadoughi | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steven Ben Cater | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Catherine Constance Webbe | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Tuppen | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Frederick George Hess | Trustee | 15 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
SEAN MICHAEL GIBBONS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.18k | £21.92k | £3.44k | £29.72k | £51.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.94k | £23.53k | £3.58k | £31.86k | £35.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 04/10/1985
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGHOUT THE WORLD IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 Croham Road
SOUTH CROYDON
Surrey
CR2 7HD
- Phone:
- 02073875191
- Email:
- londonlawyersmusic@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window