THE HOLY CHURCH OF THE SERAPHS (UNITED KINGDOM)

Charity Number: 293018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General christian activitities and teachings of edits of christianity

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £15,872
Total expenditure: £4,627

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 November 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SETH BAFFOE Chair 02 March 2011
None on record
George Boakye-Dankwa AKYEAMPONG Trustee 03 January 2025
None on record
Jemima Yaa Kraah ASAMOAH Trustee 01 March 2024
None on record
FREDERICK OSEI-AKOMEAH Trustee 23 March 2020
PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF GHANA SOUTH LONDON DISTRICT
Received: On time
VERONICA SERWAA-DWOMOH ADDO Trustee 05 April 2014
None on record
Abigail Appiasei Trustee 05 April 2014
None on record
Samuel Asamoah Trustee 05 April 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.45k £2.96k £4.22k £3.68k £15.87k
Total expenditure £7.57k £4.70k £1.24k £3.86k £4.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 March 2022 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 April 2021 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
52A CAMBRIA ROAD
LONDON
SE5 9AE
Phone:
02085226485
Website:

No information available