Financial history ARUN COUNSELLING CENTRE

Charity number: 293053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £32.31k £42.60k £36.12k £39.16k £94.18k
Total expenditure £36.00k £28.78k £35.24k £44.79k £78.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.98k N/A N/A £2.96k