THE LEUVA PATIDAR SAMAJ OF LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Committee organises religious and social functions of Holi, Navratri, and Diwali. A function specifically for children was organised at Christmas and a Fun Day for all the family in the summer. There were also other events such as a day trip to Bournemouth. A regular Newsletter was also sent to the members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 10 February 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashwin Patel | Chair | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tiku Patel | Trustee | 24 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jayesh Patel | Trustee | 24 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aruna Patel | Trustee | 24 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
BHAVIK PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.39k | £29.15k | £62.77k | £23.63k | £26.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.04k | £21.61k | £67.11k | £16.20k | £27.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH JANUARY 1986
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU RELIGION IN PARTICULAR AMONG THE HINDU COMMUNITY IN LONDON KNOWN AS LEUVA PATIDAR WHICH ORIGINATES FROM THE SUVAT, NAVASARI AND BALSAR AREA OF INDIA. (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONG THE LEUVA PATIDAR COMMUNITY (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG CHILDREN AND ADULTS OF THE LEUVA PATIDAR COMMUNITY (C) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS OF THE LEUVA PATIDAR COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR OF MEMBERS OF THAT COMMUNITY WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
91 THIRLMERE GARDENS
WEMBLEY
HA9 8RD
- Phone:
- 07970660581
- Email:
- trustees@londonsamaj.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window