PALLANT HOUSE GALLERY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public Art Gallery providing an outreach and educational programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- West Sussex
Governance
- 30 December 1985: Standard registration
- 16 June 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 16 June 2020: Funds transferred to 1102435 PALLANT HOUSE GALLERY
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 16 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 18 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 29 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 24TH OCTOBER 1985 AS AMENDED BY THE SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 17TH JUNE 1996 AND 21ST JUNE 1996 AND 19TH FEBRUARY 1999.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE FINE ARTS AND THE HISTORY OF DOMESTIC ARCHITECTURE AND IN PARTICULAR TO PRESERVE RESTORE AND FURNISH PALLANT HOUSE AS PERIOD HOUSE WITHIN WHICH TO EXHIBIT WORKS OF ART OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST FOR VIEWING BY THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
CHICHESTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window