ASSOCIATION OF TEACHERS OF MATHEMATICS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ATM supports teachers within education by providing CPD courses, publications, website resources and a bi-monthly journal to all it's members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 November 1985: Standard registration
- ATM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Lacey | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Merrill | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mx Freya Emily Price | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Roberts | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mahnaz Siddiqui | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Knights | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Emily Bridgett | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Katherine Dasgupta | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Finlay Neil Edward McLaughlin | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Perring | Trustee | 06 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Samantha Madeley | Trustee | 12 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Stevie Peter Devlin | Trustee | 12 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Spillett | Trustee | 21 September 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £375.98k | £216.75k | £229.44k | £255.01k | £271.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £343.28k | £215.01k | £195.67k | £230.71k | £271.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF A COMPANY DATED 26TH MARCH 1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/03/2015 as amended on 15 Apr 2019 as amended on 06 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE THE TEACHING AND LEARNING OF MATHEMATICS AND THE STUDY THEREOF AND TO SEEK TO IMPROVE THE METHODS USED THEREIN AND THE DOING OF ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS AS ARE INCEDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2a Vernon Street
Vernon House
Derby
DE1 1FR
- Phone:
- 01332977891
- Email:
- admin@atm.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window