Financial history FARNBOROUGH SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 293178
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £23.68k £19.67k £2.50k £23.63k £30.56k
Total expenditure £30.05k £19.05k £693 £27.33k £27.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A