Financial history THE AHL UL-BAYT (A S ) ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity number: 293187
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £486 £480 £1.12k £0 £29.57k
Total expenditure £480 £480 £965 £106.09k £4.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A